1) DE SMET - ENGINEERS & CONTRACTORS SA
RUE GRANBONPRE 11, BTE 8 1435 MONT-SAINT-GUIBERT438.987.752
DEMISSIONS, NOMINATIONS - DIVERS
2024-07-03 / 0099891 BILD
2) DE SMET - ENGINEERS & CONTRACTORS SA
RUE GRANBONPRE 11, BTE 8 1435 MONT-SAINT-GUIBERT438.987.752
DEMISSIONS, NOMINATIONS
2023-11-17 / 0146124 BILD
3) DE SMET - ENGINEERS & CONTRACTORS SA
RUE GRANBONPRE 11, BTE 8 1435 MONT-SAINT-GUIBERT438.987.752
DEMISSIONS, NOMINATIONS
2023-11-13 / 0143660 BILD
4) DE SMET - ENGINEERS & CONTRACTORS SA
RUE GRANBONPRE 11, BTE 8 1435 MONT-SAINT-GUIBERT438.987.752
DEMISSIONS, NOMINATIONS
2023-06-21 / 0080290 BILD
5) DE SMET - ENGINEERS & CONTRACTORS SA
RUE GRANBONPRE 11, BTE 8 1435 MONT-SAINT-GUIBERT438.987.752
DEMISSIONS, NOMINATIONS
2023-05-31 / 0070088 BILD
6) DE SMET - ENGINEERS & CONTRACTORS SA
RUE GRANBONPRE 11, BTE 8 1435 MONT-SAINT-GUIBERT438.987.752
DEMISSIONS, NOMINATIONS
2023-05-04 / 0059999 BILD
7) DE SMET - ENGINEERS & CONTRACTORS SA
RUE GRANBONPRE 11, BTE 8 1435 MONT-SAINT-GUIBERT438.987.752
DEMISSIONS, NOMINATIONS
2023-04-27 / 0057165 BILD
8) DE SMET - ENGINEERS & CONTRACTORS SA
RUE GRANBONPRE 11, BTE 8 1435 MONT-SAINT-GUIBERT438.987.752
CAPITAL, ACTIONS
2022-12-08 / 0144659 BILD
9) DE SMET - ENGINEERS & CONTRACTORS SA
RUE GRANBONPRE 11, BTE 8 1435 MONT-SAINT-GUIBERT438.987.752
DEMISSIONS, NOMINATIONS
2022-07-12 / 0083664 BILD
10) DE SMET - ENGINEERS & CONTRACTORS SA
RUE GRANBONPRE 11, BTE 8 1435 MONT-SAINT-GUIBERT438.987.752
DEMISSIONS, NOMINATIONS
2022-07-12 / 0083665 BILD
11) DE SMET - ENGINEERS & CONTRACTORS SA
RUE GRANBONPRE 11, BTE 8 1435 MONT-SAINT-GUIBERT438.987.752
DEMISSIONS, NOMINATIONS - DIVERS
2022-07-12 / 0083666 BILD
12) DE SMET - ENGINEERS & CONTRACTORS SA
RUE GRANBONPRE 11, BTE 8 1435 MONT-SAINT-GUIBERT438.987.752
DEMISSIONS, NOMINATIONS
2022-01-04 / 0000828 BILD
13) DE SMET - ENGINEERS & CONTRACTORS SA
RUE GRANBONPRE 11, BTE 8 1435 MONT-SAINT-GUIBERT438.987.752
DEMISSIONS, NOMINATIONS
2021-09-02 / 0105493 BILD
14) DE SMET - ENGINEERS & CONTRACTORS SA
RUE GRANBONPRE 11, BTE 8 1435 MONT-SAINT-GUIBERT438.987.752
DEMISSIONS, NOMINATIONS
2021-09-02 / 0105494 BILD
15) DE SMET - ENGINEERS & CONTRACTORS SA
RUE GRANBONPRE 11, BTE 8 1435 MONT-SAINT-GUIBERT438.987.752
DEMISSIONS, NOMINATIONS
2021-08-27 / 0103348 BILD
16) DE SMET - ENGINEERS & CONTRACTORS SA
RUE GRANBONPRE 11, BTE 8 1435 MONT-SAINT-GUIBERT438.987.752
DEMISSIONS, NOMINATIONS
2021-08-27 / 0103349 BILD
17) DE SMET - ENGINEERS & CONTRACTORS SA
RUE GRANBONPRE 11, BTE 8 1435 MONT-SAINT-GUIBERT438.987.752
DEMISSIONS, NOMINATIONS - COMPTES ANNUELS - DIVERS
2021-05-21 / 0060902 BILD
18) DE SMET - ENGINEERS & CONTRACTORS SA
RUE GRANBONPRE 11, BTE 8 1435 MONT-SAINT-GUIBERT438.987.752
DEMISSIONS, NOMINATIONS
2021-05-21 / 0060903 BILD
19) DE SMET - ENGINEERS & CONTRACTORS SA
RUE GRANBONPRE 11, BTE 8 1435 MONT-SAINT-GUIBERT438.987.752
DEMISSIONS, NOMINATIONS
2021-04-27 / 0050989 BILD
20) DE SMET - ENGINEERS & CONTRACTORS SA
RUE GRANBONPRE 11, BTE 8 1435 MONT-SAINT-GUIBERT438.987.752
DEMISSIONS, NOMINATIONS
2020-12-23 / 0152970 BILD
21) DE SMET - ENGINEERS & CONTRACTORS SA
RUE GRANBONPRE 11, BTE 8 1435 MONT-SAINT-GUIBERT438.987.752
CAPITAL, ACTIONS
2020-12-03 / 0144065 BILD
22) DE SMET - ENGINEERS & CONTRACTORS SA
RUE GRANBONPRE 11, BTE 8 1435 MONT-SAINT-GUIBERT438.987.752
DEMISSIONS, NOMINATIONS
2020-08-12 / 0092898 BILD
23) DE SMET - ENGINEERS & CONTRACTORS SA
RUE GRANBONPRE 11, BTE 8 1435 MONT-SAINT-GUIBERT438.987.752
CAPITAL, ACTIONS - STATUTS (TRADUCTION, COORDINATION, AUTRES MODIFICATIONS, …)
2020-07-30 / 0087833 BILD
24) DE SMET - ENGINEERS & CONTRACTORS SA
RUE GRANBONPRE 11, BTE 8 1435 MONT-SAINT-GUIBERT438.987.752
DEMISSIONS, NOMINATIONS - COMPTES ANNUELS
2020-05-28 / 0061356 BILD
25) DE SMET - ENGINEERS & CONTRACTORS SA
RUE GRANBONPRE 11, BTE 8 1435 MONT-SAINT-GUIBERT438.987.752
DEMISSIONS, NOMINATIONS
2019-05-10 / 0063825 BILD
26) DE SMET - ENGINEERS & CONTRACTORS SA
RUE GRANBONPRE 11, BTE 8 1435 MONT-SAINT-GUIBERT438.987.752
DEMISSIONS, NOMINATIONS
2019-04-29 / 0058607 BILD
27) DE SMET - ENGINEERS & CONTRACTORS SA
DREVE RICHELLE 161, BTE 32 1410 WATERLOO438.987.752
DEMISSIONS, NOMINATIONS
2018-09-06 / 0134900 BILD
28) DE SMET - ENGINEERS & CONTRACTORS SA
DREVE RICHELLE 161, BTE 32 1410 WATERLOO438.987.752
SIEGE SOCIAL
2018-09-06 / 0134901 BILD
29) DE SMET - ENGINEERS & CONTRACTORS SA
DREVE RICHELLE 161, BTE 32 1410 WATERLOO438.987.752
DEMISSIONS, NOMINATIONS
2018-07-03 / 0103190 BILD
30) DE SMET - ENGINEERS & CONTRACTORS SA
DREVE RICHELLE 161, BTE 32 1410 WATERLOO438.987.752
DEMISSIONS, NOMINATIONS
2018-07-03 / 0103191 BILD
31) DE SMET - ENGINEERS & CONTRACTORS SA
DREVE RICHELLE 161, BTE 32 1410 WATERLOO438.987.752
DEMISSIONS, NOMINATIONS
2018-07-03 / 0103200 BILD
32) DE SMET - ENGINEERS & CONTRACTORS SA
DREVE RICHELLE 161, BTE 32 1410 WATERLOO438.987.752
COMPTES ANNUELS
2018-05-08 / 0073775 BILD
33) DE SMET - ENGINEERS & CONTRACTORS SA
DREVE RICHELLE 161, BTE 32 1410 WATERLOO438.987.752
DEMISSIONS, NOMINATIONS
2018-05-02 / 0070429 BILD
34) DE SMET - ENGINEERS & CONTRACTORS SA
DREVE RICHELLE 161, BTE 32 1410 WATERLOO438.987.752
DIVERS
2018-05-02 / 0070430 BILD
35) DE SMET - ENGINEERS & CONTRACTORS SA
DREVE RICHELLE 161, BTE 32 1410 WATERLOO438.987.752
DEMISSIONS, NOMINATIONS
2018-02-12 / 0030171 BILD
36) DE SMET - ENGINEERS & CONTRACTORS SA
DREVE RICHELLE 161, BTE 32 1410 WATERLOO438.987.752
DEMISSIONS, NOMINATIONS
2017-05-16 / 0069384 BILD
37) DE SMET - ENGINEERS & CONTRACTORS SA
DREVE RICHELLE 161, BTE 32 1410 WATERLOO438.987.752
ME. - COMPTES ANNUELS 31.12.2015, APP 21.04.2016, DPT 13.05.2016 16121-0560-044
2016-05-23 / 0070029
38) DE SMET - ENGINEERS & CONTRACTORS SA
DREVE RICHELLE 161, BTE 32 1410 WATERLOO438.987.752
DEMISSIONS, NOMINATIONS - COMPTES ANNUELS
2016-05-12 / 0065660 BILD
39) DE SMET - ENGINEERS & CONTRACTORS SA
DREVE RICHELLE 161, BTE 32 1410 WATERLOO438.987.752
DEMISSIONS, NOMINATIONS
2016-03-23 / 0041922 BILD
40) DE SMET - ENGINEERS & CONTRACTORS SA
DREVE RICHELLE 161, BTE 32 1410 WATERLOO438.987.752
DIVERS
2015-07-10 / 0099488 BILD
41) DE SMET - ENGINEERS & CONTRACTORS SA
DREVE RICHELLE 161, BTE 32 1410 WATERLOO438.987.752
ME. - COMPTES ANNUELS 31.12.2014, APP 26.06.2015, DPT 06.07.2015 15281-0357-046
2015-07-10 / 0160931
42) DE SMET - ENGINEERS & CONTRACTORS SA
DREVE RICHELLE 161, BTE 32 1410 WATERLOO438.987.752
DEMISSIONS, NOMINATIONS
2015-06-18 / 0086406 BILD
43) DE SMET - ENGINEERS & CONTRACTORS SA
DREVE RICHELLE 161, BTE 32 1410 WATERLOO438.987.752
DEMISSIONS, NOMINATIONS - ASSEMBLEE GENERALE
2015-05-04 / 0063359 BILD
44) DE SMET - ENGINEERS & CONTRACTORS SA
DREVE RICHELLE 161, BTE 32 1410 WATERLOO438.987.752
DEMISSIONS, NOMINATIONS
2014-09-01 / 0163166 BILD
45) DE SMET - ENGINEERS & CONTRACTORS SA
DREVE RICHELLE 161, BTE 32 1410 WATERLOO438.987.752
DEMISSIONS, NOMINATIONS
2014-07-17 / 0139118 BILD
46) DE SMET - ENGINEERS & CONTRACTORS SA
DREVE RICHELLE 161, BTE 32 1410 WATERLOO438.987.752
DEMISSIONS, NOMINATIONS
2014-07-17 / 0139119 BILD
47) DE SMET - ENGINEERS & CONTRACTORS SA
DREVE RICHELLE 161, BTE 32 1410 WATERLOO438.987.752
DEMISSIONS, NOMINATIONS
2014-06-12 / 0115646 BILD
48) DE SMET - ENGINEERS & CONTRACTORS SA
DREVE RICHELLE 161, BTE 32 1410 WATERLOO438.987.752
ME. - COMPTES ANNUELS 31.12.2013, APP 15.05.2014, DPT 02.06.2014 14147-0391-046
2014-06-05 / 0084864
49) DE SMET - ENGINEERS & CONTRACTORS SA
DREVE RICHELLE 161, BTE 32 1410 WATERLOO438.987.752
DEMISSIONS, NOMINATIONS
2014-05-30 / 0109444 BILD
50) DE SMET - ENGINEERS & CONTRACTORS SA
DREVE RICHELLE 161, BTE 32 1410 WATERLOO438.987.752
DEMISSIONS, NOMINATIONS
2014-05-07 / 0094564 BILD
51) DE SMET - ENGINEERS & CONTRACTORS SA
DREVE RICHELLE 161, BTE 32 - W O P BAT : O 1410 WATERLOO438.987.752
DEMISSIONS, NOMINATIONS
2013-05-24 / 0078554 BILD
52) DE SMET - ENGINEERS & CONTRACTORS SA
DREVE RICHELLE 161, BTE 32 - W O P BAT : O 1410 WATERLOO438.987.752
ME. - COMPTES ANNUELS 31.12.2012, APP 18.04.2013, DPT 14.05.2013 13120-0155-046
2013-05-18 / 0070521
53) DE SMET - ENGINEERS & CONTRACTORS SA
DREVE RICHELLE 161, BTE 32 - W O P BAT : O 1410 WATERLOO438.987.752
DEMISSIONS, NOMINATIONS
2012-07-16 / 0124689 BILD
54) DE SMET - ENGINEERS & CONTRACTORS SA
DREVE RICHELLE 161, BTE 32 - W O P BAT : O 1410 WATERLOO438.987.752
DEMISSIONS, NOMINATIONS
2012-07-16 / 0124693 BILD
55) DE SMET - ENGINEERS & CONTRACTORS SA
DREVE RICHELLE 161, BTE 32 - W O P BAT : O 1410 WATERLOO438.987.752
DEMISSIONS, NOMINATIONS
2012-06-21 / 0110222 BILD
56) DE SMET - ENGINEERS & CONTRACTORS SA
DREVE RICHELLE 161, BTE 32 - W O P BAT : O 1410 WATERLOO438.987.752
ME. - COMPTES ANNUELS 31.12.2011, APP 19.04.2012, DPT 08.05.2012 12112-0182-047
2012-05-15 / 0066906
57) DE SMET - ENGINEERS & CONTRACTORS SA
DREVE RICHELLE 161, BTE 32 - W O P BAT : O 1410 WATERLOO438.987.752
ME. - COMPTES ANNUELS 31.12.2010, APP 29.06.2011, DPT 27.07.2011 11350-0274-051
2011-08-02 / 0203978
58) DE SMET - ENGINEERS & CONTRACTORS SA
DREVE RICHELLE 161, BTE 32 - W O P BAT : O 1410 WATERLOO438.987.752
DEMISSIONS, NOMINATIONS - DIVERS
2011-07-19 / 0110536 BILD
59) DE SMET - ENGINEERS & CONTRACTORS SA
DREVE RICHELLE 161, BTE 32 - W O P BAT : O 1410 WATERLOO438.987.752
DEMISSIONS, NOMINATIONS - ASSEMBLEE GENERALE
2011-07-19 / 0110537 BILD
60) DE SMET - ENGINEERS & CONTRACTORS SA
DREVE RICHELLE 161, BTE 32 - W O P BAT : O 1410 WATERLOO438.987.752
DEMISSIONS, NOMINATIONS
2011-03-24 / 0045245 BILD
61) DE SMET - ENGINEERS & CONTRACTORS SA
AVENUE REINE ASTRID 92 1310 LA HULPE438.987.752
SIEGE SOCIAL
2010-08-25 / 0126355 BILD
62) DE SMET - ENGINEERS & CONTRACTORS SA
AVENUE REINE ASTRID 92 1310 LA HULPE438.987.752
ME. - COMPTES ANNUELS 31.12.2009, APP 07.05.2010, DPT 31.05.2010 10144-0576-050
2010-06-07 / 0078170
63) DE SMET - ENGINEERS & CONTRACTORS SA
AVENUE REINE ASTRID 92 1310 LA HULPE438.987.752
DEMISSIONS, NOMINATIONS
2010-05-26 / 0075552 BILD
64) DE SMET - ENGINEERS & CONTRACTORS SA
AVENUE REINE ASTRID 92 1310 LA HULPE438.987.752
CAPITAL, ACTIONS - DEMISSIONS, NOMINATIONS - STATUTS (TRADUCTION, COORDINATION, AUTRES MODIFICATIONS, …)
2009-07-29 / 0108127 BILD
65) DE SMET - ENGINEERS & CONTRACTORS SA
AVENUE REINE ASTRID 92 1310 LA HULPE438.987.752
DEMISSIONS, NOMINATIONS
2009-07-20 / 0102869 BILD
66) DE SMET - ENGINEERS & CONTRACTORS SA
AVENUE REINE ASTRID 92 1310 LA HULPE438.987.752
ME. - COMPTES ANNUELS 31.12.2008, APP 29.06.2009, DPT 16.07.2009 09418-0247-049
2009-07-20 / 0166305
67) DE SMET - ENGINEERS & CONTRACTORS SA
AVENUE REINE ASTRID 92 1310 LA HULPE438.987.752
ME. - COMPTES ANNUELS 31.12.2007, APP 04.06.2008, DPT 24.07.2008 08449-0134-041
2008-07-31 / 0188886
68) DE SMET - ENGINEERS & CONTRACTORS SA
AVENUE REINE ASTRID 92 1310 LA HULPE438.987.752
DEMISSIONS, NOMINATIONS
2008-06-18 / 0089363 BILD
69) DE SMET - ENGINEERS & CONTRACTORS SA
AVENUE REINE ASTRID 92 1310 LA HULPE438.987.752
DEMISSIONS, NOMINATIONS
2008-05-27 / 0077638 BILD
70) DE SMET - ENGINEERS & CONTRACTORS SA
AVENUE REINE ASTRID 92 1310 LA HULPE438.987.752
DEMISSIONS, NOMINATIONS
2007-10-16 / 0150524 BILD
71) DE SMET - ENGINEERS & CONTRACTORS SA
AVENUE REINE ASTRID 92 1310 LA HULPE438.987.752
DEMISSIONS, NOMINATIONS
2007-10-16 / 0150525 BILD
72) DE SMET - ENGINEERS & CONTRACTORS SA
AVENUE REINE ASTRID 92 1310 LA HULPE438.987.752
ME. - COMPTES ANNUELS 31.12.2006, APP 19.04.2007, DPT 18.07.2007 07415-0266-040
2007-07-27 / 0169194
73) DE SMET - ENGINEERS & CONTRACTORS SA
AVENUE REINE ASTRID 92 1310 LA HULPE438.987.752
DEMISSIONS, NOMINATIONS
2007-05-21 / 0072453 BILD
74) DE SMET - ENGINEERS & CONTRACTORS SA
AVENUE REINE ASTRID 92 1310 LA HULPE438.987.752
ME. - COMPTES ANNUELS 31.12.2005, APP 20.04.2006, DPT 02.08.2006 06600-3873-026
2006-08-03 / 0204975
75) DE SMET - ENGINEERS & CONTRACTORS SA
AVENUE REINE ASTRID 92 1310 LA HULPE438.987.752
DEMISSIONS, NOMINATIONS
2006-06-21 / 0100258 BILD
76) DE SMET - ENGINEERS & CONTRACTORS SA
AVENUE REINE ASTRID 92 1310 LA HULPE438.987.752
DEMISSIONS, NOMINATIONS - CAPITAL, ACTIONS - DIVERS
2005-06-22 / 0088151 BILD
77) DE SMET - ENGINEERS & CONTRACTORS SA
AVENUE REINE ASTRID 92 1310 LA HULPE438.987.752
ME. - COMPTES ANNUELS 31.12.2004, APP 21.04.2005, DPT 18.05.2005 05153-3681-026
2005-05-23 / 0057759
78) DE SMET - ENGINEERS & CONTRACTORS SA
AVENUE REINE ASTRID 92 1310 LA HULPE438.987.752
CAPITAL, ACTIONS - ANNEE COMPTABLE - ASSEMBLEE GENERALE - STATUTS (TRADUCTION, COORDINATION, AUTRES MODIFICATIONS, …)
2005-01-05 / 0001922 BILD
79) DE SMET - ENGINEERS & CONTRACTORS SA
AVENUE REINE ASTRID 92 1310 LA HULPE438.987.752
ME. - COMPTES ANNUELS 31.03.2004, APP 01.10.2004, DPT 23.11.2004 04804-0944-026
2004-11-26 / 0283538
80) DE SMET - ENGINEERS & CONTRACTORS SA
AVENUE REINE ASTRID 92 1310 LA HULPE438.987.752
DEMISSIONS, NOMINATIONS
2004-10-21 / 0148091 BILD
81) DE SMET - ENGINEERS & CONTRACTORS SA
AVENUE REINE ASTRID 92 1310 LA HULPE438.987.752
DEMISSIONS, NOMINATIONS
2004-10-18 / 0145875 BILD
82) DE SMET - ENGINEERS AND CONTRACTORS SA
AVENUE DE TERVUEREN.446 1150 WOLUWE-SAINT-PIERRE438.987.752
SIEGE SOCIAL
2004-08-26 / 0123950 BILD
83) DE SMET - ENGINEERS AND CONTRACTORS SA
AVENUE DE TERVUEREN.446 1150 WOLUWE-SAINT-PIERRE438.987.752
DEMISSIONS, NOMINATIONS
2004-07-13 / 0103794 BILD
84) DE SMET - ENGINEERS AND CONTRACTORS SA
AVENUE DE TERVUEREN.446 1150 WOLUWE-SAINT-PIERRE438.987.752
DEMISSIONS, NOMINATIONS
2004-06-17 / 0089106 BILD
85) DE SMET - ENGINEERS AND CONTRACTORS SA
AVENUE DE TERVUEREN.446 1150 WOLUWE-SAINT-PIERRE438.987.752
ASSEMBLEE GENERALE - CAPITAL, ACTIONS - STATUTS (TRADUCTION, COORDINATION, AUTRES MODIFICATIONS, …) - ANNEE COMPTABLE
2004-01-28 / 0014270 BILD
86) DE SMET - ENGINEERS AND CONTRACTORS SA
AVENUE DE TERVUEREN.446 1150 WOLUWE-SAINT-PIERRE438.987.752
ME. - COMPTES ANNUELS 31.12.2002, APP 16.06.2003 03427-0254-029
2003-07-28 / 0162336
87) DE SMET - ENGINEERS AND CONTRACTORS SA
AVENUE DE TERVUEREN.446 1150 WOLUWE-SAINT-PIERRE438.987.752
ME. - COMPTES ANNUELS 31.12.2001, APP 23.05.2002 02489-0203-031
2002-09-02 / 0173846
88) DE SMET - ENGINEERS AND CONTRACTORS SA
AVENUE DE TERVUEREN.446 1150 WOLUWE-SAINT-PIERRE438.987.752
DEMISSIONS, NOMINATIONS
2002-08-31 / 1271 BILD
89) DE SMET - ENGINEERS AND CONTRACTORS SA
AVENUE DE TERVUEREN.446 1150 WOLUWE-SAINT-PIERRE438.987.752
CAPITAL, ACTIONS
2002-04-04 / 484 BILD
90) DE SMET - ENGINEERS AND CONTRACTORS SA
AVENUE DE TERVUEREN.446 1150 WOLUWE-SAINT-PIERRE438.987.752
ME. - COMPTES ANNUELS 31.12.2000, APP 28.05.2001 01562-0103-030
2001-09-26 / 0200227
91) DE SMET - ENGINEERS AND CONTRACTORS SA
AVENUE DE TERVUEREN.446 1150 WOLUWE-SAINT-PIERRE438.987.752
DEMISSIONS, NOMINATIONS
2000-08-19 / 020 BILD
92) DE SMET - ENGINEERS AND CONTRACTORS SA
AVENUE DE TERVUEREN.446 1150 WOLUWE-SAINT-PIERRE438.987.752
ME. - COMPTES ANNUELS 31.12.1999, APP 25.05.2000 00472-0228-031
2000-08-09 / 0172404
93) DE SMET - ENGINEERS AND CONTRACTORS SA
AVENUE DE TERVUEREN.446 1150 WOLUWE-SAINT-PIERRE438.987.752
ASSEMBLEE GENERALE - CAPITAL, ACTIONS - STATUTS (TRADUCTION, COORDINATION, AUTRES MODIFICATIONS, …)
2000-03-15 / 302 BILD
94) DE SMET - ENGINEERS AND CONTRACTORS SA
AVENUE DE TERVUEREN.446 1150 WOLUWE-SAINT-PIERRE438.987.752
ME. - COMPTES ANNUELS 31.12.1998, APP 27.04.1999 - 99269-3120-032
1999-07-14 / 0114134
95) DE SMET - ENGINEERS AND CONTRACTORS SA
AVENUE DE TERVUEREN.446 1150 WOLUWE-SAINT-PIERRE438.987.752
DEMISSIONS, NOMINATIONS
1999-07-06 / 160 BILD
96) DE SMET - ENGINEERS AND CONTRACTORS SA
AVENUE DE TERVUEREN.446 1150 WOLUWE-SAINT-PIERRE438.987.752
DEMISSIONS, NOMINATIONS
1999-01-05 / 802 BILD
97) DE SMET - ENGINEERS AND CONTRACTORS SA
WOLUWE-SAINT-PIERRE438.987.752
DEMISSIONS, NOMINATIONS
1998-09-18 / 152 BILD
98) DE SMET - ENGINEERS AND CONTRACTORS SA
WOLUWE-SAINT-PIERRE438.987.752
ME. - COMPTES ANNUELS 31.12.97, APP 28.04.98 - 98237-5226-031
1998 / 094925
99) DE SMET - ENGINEERS AND CONTRACTORS SA
WOLUWE-SAINT-PIERRE438.987.752
ME. - COMPTES ANNUELS 31.12.96, APP 22.04.97 - 97382-1744-030
1997 / 148951
100) DE SMET - ENGINEERS AND CONTRACTORS SA
WOLUWE-SAINT-PIERRE438.987.752
DEMISSIONS, NOMINATIONS
1996-06-29 / 221